Refine your search

Refined by:

Wisconsin Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/22/1998
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/19/1998
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 07/15/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/31/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/11/1998