Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 03/26/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/30/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 03/31/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/21/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/21/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/21/1998
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/21/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/21/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/21/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 04/22/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/22/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 04/22/1998
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/22/1998
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 04/23/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/29/1998
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/29/1998
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/30/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/30/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 04/30/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/30/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/06/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/06/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/12/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/12/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/14/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 05/14/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/14/1998
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/19/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/19/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/19/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/03/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 06/04/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/04/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/05/1998
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 06/05/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/05/1998
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/05/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 06/10/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 06/10/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/16/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 06/16/1998
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/23/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 06/24/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/25/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/25/1998
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/14/1998
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 07/14/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/14/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/14/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/14/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/14/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/15/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 07/16/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/31/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 08/06/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 08/06/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/09/1998
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/09/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/11/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/16/1998