Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/26/1998
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 03/26/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 04/21/1998
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/21/1998
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/23/1998
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 04/23/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 04/28/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/29/1998
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/29/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/30/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/05/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/05/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 05/05/1998
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/05/1998
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/05/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/06/1998
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 05/07/1998
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 05/12/1998
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/12/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/13/1998
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 05/14/1998
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/19/1998
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/19/1998
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 05/19/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/21/1998
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/03/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/03/1998
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 06/04/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/10/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/10/1998
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 06/10/1998
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 06/16/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 06/17/1998
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 06/23/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/25/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 07/14/1998
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/14/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/14/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/15/1998
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 07/15/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/15/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 07/16/1998
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/17/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 07/24/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/29/1998