Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 03/26/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 03/26/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/26/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 03/26/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/26/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 03/26/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/01/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 04/01/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/21/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 04/21/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/21/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/21/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/21/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/21/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/28/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/28/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/28/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/28/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 05/06/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/06/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/06/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/18/1998
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 05/18/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/18/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/18/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/18/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/19/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/21/1998
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/21/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/22/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/04/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/04/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/11/1998
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 06/25/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/14/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/14/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 09/09/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/09/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 09/09/1998