Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 03/27/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/21/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/21/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/21/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/29/1998
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 04/29/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/05/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/05/1998
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/14/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 05/14/1998
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/14/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/14/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/14/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/14/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/14/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/14/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/21/1998
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/21/1998
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 05/21/1998
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 05/22/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/03/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/03/1998
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/03/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/03/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/09/1998
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/09/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/09/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/11/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/11/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/11/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/19/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/19/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/19/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/19/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/19/1998
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/19/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/19/1998
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/19/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 06/19/1998
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/25/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/25/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/25/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/25/1998
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/25/1998
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/25/1998
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 06/25/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/25/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/25/1998
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/25/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/20/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/20/1998
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/20/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/20/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/20/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/20/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/20/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/24/1998
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 08/03/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 08/03/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 08/06/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 08/06/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 08/06/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 08/06/1998
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 08/06/1998
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/10/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/10/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/18/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 09/18/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/25/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/25/1998
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 09/25/1998
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/25/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 09/25/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/25/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 10/01/1998
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/01/1998
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8] 10/06/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/06/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 10/06/1998
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 10/09/1998
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/13/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/15/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 10/20/1998