Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/29/1998
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/12/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/09/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/09/1998
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/09/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 07/21/1998
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 08/05/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/24/1998