Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/31/1998
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/31/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 03/31/1998
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 03/31/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 03/31/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/31/1998
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 04/01/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 04/01/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 04/01/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/01/1998
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/01/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 04/01/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 04/01/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 04/01/1998
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/22/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/22/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/22/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/22/1998
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/22/1998
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/22/1998
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 04/22/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 04/22/1998
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 04/22/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/22/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/22/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 04/22/1998
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/22/1998
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/22/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/22/1998
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 04/22/1998
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/22/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/28/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/28/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/28/1998
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 04/28/1998
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 04/28/1998
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/28/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/29/1998
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/29/1998
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/29/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 04/29/1998
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/29/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 04/29/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/29/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 04/29/1998
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 04/29/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/30/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/30/1998
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/30/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/30/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/30/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 05/05/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/07/1998
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/07/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/07/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/12/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/12/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/12/1998
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/12/1998
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 05/19/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/19/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/19/1998
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/19/1998
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/19/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/19/1998
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 05/19/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/19/1998
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/20/1998
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/20/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 05/20/1998
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 05/20/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 05/21/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/21/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 05/21/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 05/21/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 05/21/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/21/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/21/1998
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/21/1998
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 05/21/1998
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8] 05/21/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/21/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/21/1998
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 05/22/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/03/1998
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/04/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 06/10/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/10/1998
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/10/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/10/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/10/1998
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/10/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/10/1998
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/10/1998
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 06/10/1998
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/19/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/19/1998
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/24/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/24/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/15/1998
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/15/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/15/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew