Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 03/31/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/31/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 03/31/1998
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 03/31/1998
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 04/01/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 04/01/1998
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 04/01/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/01/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/22/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 04/22/1998
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/22/1998
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 04/22/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/22/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/22/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/22/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/23/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 04/23/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 04/23/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/29/1998
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 04/29/1998
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/29/1998
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 04/30/1998
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/30/1998
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 05/05/1998
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/05/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/12/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/12/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/12/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/12/1998
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 05/12/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/12/1998
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 05/12/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 05/12/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/12/1998
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/12/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 05/12/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/12/1998
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/12/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 05/14/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/14/1998
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/14/1998
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/14/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/14/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/14/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 05/14/1998
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/20/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/20/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/20/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/20/1998
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 05/20/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/09/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/09/1998
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 06/09/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/09/1998
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/09/1998
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/09/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/09/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/09/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 06/09/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/09/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/09/1998
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 06/09/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/09/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/09/1998
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 06/10/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/10/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/10/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/10/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/10/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/11/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/11/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/11/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/18/1998
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 06/18/1998
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/18/1998
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/18/1998
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/18/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/18/1998
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8] 06/18/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/23/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 06/25/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/15/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 07/15/1998
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/15/1998
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 07/15/1998
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/15/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 07/15/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/20/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/20/1998
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/22/1998
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/24/1998
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/24/1998
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/29/1998
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 08/03/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 08/03/1998
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 08/04/1998
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 08/06/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 09/16/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 09/16/1998
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 09/16/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/16/1998