Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 03/31/1998
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 03/31/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/31/1998
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 03/31/1998
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 03/31/1998
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 04/23/1998
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/23/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/23/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/23/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/23/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/23/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/23/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/23/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 04/23/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/23/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 04/23/1998
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/23/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/23/1998
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/23/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 04/23/1998
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 04/23/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/23/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 04/23/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/23/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/23/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/28/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 04/28/1998
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/30/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 05/05/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/05/1998
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 05/05/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/05/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/05/1998
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 05/06/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/06/1998
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 05/07/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 05/07/1998
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 05/13/1998
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 05/14/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/14/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/14/1998
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 07/22/1998
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/22/1998