Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/06/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/06/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/06/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/06/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/06/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/06/1998
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/06/1998
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/06/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/06/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/06/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/06/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 05/06/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 05/06/1998
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 05/20/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/20/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/20/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/05/1998
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/05/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/05/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/05/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/05/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/05/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/05/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/05/1998
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/05/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 06/11/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/16/1998
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/18/1998
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 06/24/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 06/24/1998
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 07/30/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 08/06/1998
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 08/06/1998
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/11/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/11/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/11/1998
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 09/24/1998
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/26/1998
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 10/01/1998