Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 04/01/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/29/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/29/1998
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 04/29/1998
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 04/29/1998
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/29/1998
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 04/29/1998
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 04/29/1998
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 04/29/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/29/1998
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/29/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 05/13/1998
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/13/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/13/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/13/1998
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/13/1998
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/13/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/13/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 05/13/1998
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/13/1998
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 05/13/1998
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 05/13/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 05/13/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 05/13/1998
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/13/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/03/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/03/1998
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/03/1998
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/03/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/03/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 06/03/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/03/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 06/03/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/03/1998
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/03/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/03/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/03/1998
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/03/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/03/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/03/1998
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/22/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/22/1998
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/22/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 06/22/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/22/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/22/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 06/22/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/22/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/22/1998
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 06/22/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/22/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/22/1998
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/22/1998
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 06/22/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/22/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/22/1998
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/22/1998
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 06/22/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/22/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/22/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/22/1998
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 06/22/1998
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 06/22/1998
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 06/22/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/22/1998
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/22/1998
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/22/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/22/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/22/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 07/22/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/22/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 07/22/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 07/22/1998
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/22/1998
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 07/22/1998
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 07/22/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 07/22/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/22/1998
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 07/22/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 07/22/1998
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 07/22/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 07/22/1998
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/22/1998
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 07/22/1998
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/22/1998
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 09/11/1998
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 09/11/1998
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/11/1998
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 09/11/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/11/1998
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 09/11/1998
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 10/10/1998
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 10/10/1998