Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 04/01/1998
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/28/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/28/1998
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 04/28/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 04/28/1998
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/28/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 04/28/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/30/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 04/30/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 04/30/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/05/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/05/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/05/1998
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/05/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/06/1998
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/06/1998
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/06/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/07/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/12/1998
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/12/1998
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 05/12/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/12/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/12/1998
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/14/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/14/1998
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 05/14/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/19/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/19/1998
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 05/22/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/22/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/22/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/22/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/22/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/22/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/03/1998
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/03/1998
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/03/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/09/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/09/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/09/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/09/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/10/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 06/10/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/11/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/11/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 06/11/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/16/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/22/1998
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/23/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/23/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 06/23/1998
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/24/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/24/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/24/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/24/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/24/1998
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 06/24/1998
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/24/1998
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/24/1998
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/24/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/14/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/14/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/14/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/14/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/14/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 07/14/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/14/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/14/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/14/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 07/14/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/14/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/14/1998
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/14/1998
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/14/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/14/1998
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/14/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/14/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 07/14/1998
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/16/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 07/16/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/16/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/21/1998
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/21/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 07/21/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/21/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 07/22/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/22/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/22/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/27/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/27/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/10/1998
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/11/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/24/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 09/24/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/24/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/24/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/24/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/24/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/24/1998