Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/01/1998
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 04/01/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/23/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/23/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/23/1998
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 04/23/1998
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/23/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 04/23/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/20/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/20/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/20/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/20/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/20/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/20/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/20/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 05/20/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/20/1998
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/20/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/20/1998
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/20/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/09/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/09/1998
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/09/1998
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 06/09/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/09/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/09/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/25/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 06/25/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/25/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/25/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 06/25/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/28/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/28/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/28/1998