There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

U.S. Holocaust Assets Commission Act of 1998

Short Titles as Introduced

U.S. Holocaust Assets Commission Act of 1998

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a commission to examine issues pertaining to the disposition of Holocaust-era assets in the United States before, during, and after World War II, and to make recommendations to the President on further action, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
06/09/1998Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
04/01/1998Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date All Actions
06/09/1998-4:55pmLaid on the table. See S. 1900 for further action. (consideration: CR H4273)
Action By: House of Representatives
06/09/1998-4:51pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/09/1998-4:51pmOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/09/1998-4:30pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/09/1998-4:29pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4267-4273)
Action By: House of Representatives
06/09/1998-4:29pmMr. Leach moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/04/1998Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Banking and Financial Services
06/04/1998Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Banking and Financial Services
04/01/1998Referred to the House Committee on Banking and Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/01/1998Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/05/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 06/05/1998
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/05/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/05/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/05/1998
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/05/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/05/1998
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 06/09/1998
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 06/09/1998
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/09/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/09/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 06/09/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 06/09/1998
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/09/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 06/09/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/09/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/09/1998
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 06/09/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/09/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/09/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 06/09/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/09/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/09/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 06/09/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/09/1998
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/09/1998
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 06/09/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/09/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/09/1998
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/09/1998

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Banking and Financial Services04/01/1998 Referred to
06/04/1998 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3662. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/09/1998)

U.S. Holocaust Assets Commission Act of 1998 - Establishes the Presidential Advisory Commission on Holocaust Assets in the United States to: (1) study and develop a historical record of the collection and disposition of specified assets of Holocaust victims in the possession or control of the Federal Government (including the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System and any Federal reserve bank), after January 30, 1933 (including certain gold assets obtained by the Nazi government of Germany from governmental institutions in Nazi-occupied areas); (2) coordinate its activities with private and governmental entities (including the international Washington Conference on Holocaust-era Assets); (3) encourage the National Association of Insurance Commissioners to report on Holocaust-related claims practices of insurance companies doing business in the United States after January 30, 1933, that issued insurance policies to individuals on designated Holocaust-victim lists; (4) review comprehensively research conducted by other entities regarding such assets in the United States; and (5) report its recommendations to the President.

Instructs the President to report recommendations for action to the Congress.

Directs the Administrator of General Services, upon Commission request, to provide administrative support services on a reimbursable basis.

Authorizes appropriations for FY 1998 through 2000.