Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/21/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 04/23/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 04/23/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/12/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/15/1998