Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 04/01/1998
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 04/01/1998
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 04/01/1998
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 04/01/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 04/01/1998
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 04/01/1998
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 04/01/1998
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 04/01/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 04/01/1998
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/21/1998
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/21/1998
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/30/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/30/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/06/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/12/1998
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 05/12/1998
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/13/1998
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 05/13/1998
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 05/21/1998
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 05/21/1998
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/03/1998
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 06/03/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/03/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 06/03/1998
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/03/1998
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/03/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/03/1998
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 06/04/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 06/10/1998
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/10/1998
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 06/10/1998
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 06/10/1998
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 06/10/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 06/10/1998
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/10/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 06/16/1998
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/16/1998
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 06/16/1998
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 06/18/1998
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/18/1998
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/18/1998
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 06/18/1998
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/18/1998
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/25/1998
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/25/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 06/25/1998