Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 04/22/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 05/06/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/06/1998
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/06/1998
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/06/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/06/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/06/1998
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 05/06/1998
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/06/1998
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 05/06/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/06/1998
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/06/1998
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 05/06/1998
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/06/1998
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 05/06/1998
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/06/1998
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 05/06/1998
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 05/20/1998
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 05/20/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/20/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/20/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/20/1998
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/20/1998
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 05/20/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/20/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 06/03/1998
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 06/03/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 06/03/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/03/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/03/1998
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/03/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 06/23/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/23/1998
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/23/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 06/23/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 08/06/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 08/06/1998
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 10/07/1998