There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Hmong Veterans' Naturalization Act of 1997

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To expedite the naturalization of aliens who served with special guerrilla units in Laos.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/07/1997Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
10/21/1998Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E2278-2279)
Action By: House of Representatives
06/17/1998Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 20 - 9.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/17/1998Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/11/1998Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims
06/11/1998Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims
06/26/1997Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims
01/28/1997Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/07/1997Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/07/1997Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E3-4)
Action By: House of Representatives
01/07/1997Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (77)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 02/05/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/05/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/05/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 02/12/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 02/12/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 02/12/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/12/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 02/12/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 03/05/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 03/05/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/05/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/05/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 03/13/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/13/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 03/20/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/20/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/20/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 04/24/1997
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/24/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/20/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 05/20/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 05/20/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/20/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 06/19/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 07/31/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 07/31/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/04/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 09/16/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/22/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/30/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/30/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 11/13/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 01/28/1998
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 02/11/1998
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 02/11/1998
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 02/11/1998
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 02/11/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/11/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 02/11/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 02/11/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/11/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 02/24/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/24/1998
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 02/24/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 02/24/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/26/1998
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 02/26/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/04/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/05/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/05/1998
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/11/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 03/19/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 04/01/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/22/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 04/22/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/28/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 05/13/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/21/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/21/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/21/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/21/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/22/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/04/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/04/1998
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/04/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/04/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/05/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/17/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 06/18/1998
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 06/23/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 10/09/1998
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/09/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 10/09/1998
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-44] 10/09/1998
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 10/13/1998
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/13/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/14/1998

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/07/1997 Referred to
06/17/1998 Markup by
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims01/28/1997 Referred to
06/26/1997 Hearings by
06/11/1998 Markup by
06/11/1998 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (14)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.371. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/07/1997)

Hmong Veterans' Naturalization Act of 1997 - Waives the English language naturalization requirement for certain aliens (or their spouses or widows) who served with special guerilla units in Laos.

Provides for naturalization under the Immigration and Nationality Act through such service.