Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 04/22/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 04/22/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 04/22/1998
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 04/22/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/22/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/22/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/13/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 05/13/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/13/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/13/1998
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/13/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 05/13/1998
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 05/13/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/13/1998
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/13/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/13/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 05/13/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/13/1998
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/13/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/13/1998
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 05/13/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/21/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/21/1998
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/21/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/21/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/21/1998
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 05/21/1998
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 05/21/1998
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 05/21/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/21/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/18/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 06/18/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/18/1998
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 06/18/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/18/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/18/1998
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 06/18/1998
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 06/18/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/18/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/18/1998
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 06/18/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 06/18/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/18/1998
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 06/18/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 07/20/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 07/20/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/20/1998
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 07/20/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 07/20/1998
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 07/20/1998
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/20/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/20/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/20/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/20/1998
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/20/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/20/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/20/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/20/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/20/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/20/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/20/1998
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/20/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/20/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/20/1998
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 07/20/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/20/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/20/1998
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 07/20/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/20/1998
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 07/20/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/20/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/20/1998
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 08/05/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 08/05/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 08/05/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 08/05/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 08/05/1998
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 08/05/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 08/05/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 08/05/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 08/05/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 08/05/1998
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 08/05/1998
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 08/05/1998
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 08/05/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/18/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/18/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/18/1998
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/18/1998
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/18/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 09/18/1998
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 09/18/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/18/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 09/18/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/18/1998
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/18/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 10/11/1998