Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 04/29/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/29/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/29/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 04/29/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/29/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 04/29/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 04/29/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 04/29/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/29/1998
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 04/29/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 04/29/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 04/29/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/29/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 04/29/1998
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/29/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 04/29/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/29/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/29/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 04/29/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 04/29/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 04/29/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 04/29/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 04/29/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/30/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/30/1998
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/30/1998
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/30/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/30/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/07/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/07/1998
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/07/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/07/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 05/07/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/07/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/07/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 05/07/1998
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 05/07/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/22/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/03/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/03/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/11/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/11/1998