Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 04/30/1998
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 04/30/1998
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 04/30/1998
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 04/30/1998
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 04/30/1998
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 04/30/1998
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 04/30/1998
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 04/30/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 04/30/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 04/30/1998
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 04/30/1998
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 05/06/1998
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 05/07/1998
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/13/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/09/1998