Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 04/30/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/07/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/07/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/07/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/07/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/07/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/07/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/07/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/07/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/07/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/07/1998
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/07/1998
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/07/1998
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 05/07/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/07/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/07/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/07/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/07/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/07/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/07/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/07/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/07/1998
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 05/07/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/07/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/09/1998
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/09/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/09/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/09/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/09/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/09/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/09/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/09/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/09/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 06/09/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/09/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/09/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/09/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/09/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/09/1998
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 06/09/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/09/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/09/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/09/1998
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/09/1998
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/09/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/09/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/09/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/09/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/09/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/09/1998
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/09/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 06/09/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/09/1998
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/09/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 06/09/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 06/09/1998
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/25/1998
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/25/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 06/25/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 06/25/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/25/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/25/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/25/1998
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/20/1998
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 07/20/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/20/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/20/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/20/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 07/20/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/20/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 07/20/1998
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 07/20/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/20/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/20/1998
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/20/1998
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/20/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 07/22/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/22/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 08/05/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 08/05/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 08/05/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 08/05/1998
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 08/05/1998
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 08/05/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 08/05/1998
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 08/05/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 08/05/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 08/05/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 08/05/1998
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 08/05/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 08/05/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 09/09/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/09/1998
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/09/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/09/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 09/09/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/11/1998
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/11/1998
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 09/11/1998
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/11/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 09/28/1998
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8] 09/28/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/28/1998
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 10/02/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 10/02/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/06/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/09/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/09/1998
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 10/09/1998
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 10/09/1998
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 10/13/1998
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 10/13/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 10/16/1998