Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 04/30/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 04/30/1998
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 04/30/1998
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 04/30/1998
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 04/30/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 04/30/1998
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 04/30/1998
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 04/30/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 04/30/1998
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 05/06/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/14/1998
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 05/14/1998
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 05/20/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/20/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/04/1998
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 06/04/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 06/04/1998
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/04/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 06/04/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/04/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/04/1998
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/16/1998
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/16/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/16/1998
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 06/16/1998
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/16/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/22/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/25/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 06/25/1998
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 06/25/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/25/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 07/15/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/15/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/15/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/15/1998
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 07/15/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 07/15/1998
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 07/17/1998
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 07/24/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 07/24/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/24/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 07/24/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/31/1998
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/31/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 08/07/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 08/07/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 08/07/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 08/07/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/10/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/10/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 09/16/1998
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/16/1998
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 09/16/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/16/1998
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 09/16/1998
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 09/16/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/16/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/16/1998
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 09/22/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 09/22/1998
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/23/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 09/28/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/28/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/28/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/07/1998