Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 05/05/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 05/05/1998
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 05/05/1998
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 05/05/1998
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 05/05/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 05/05/1998
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 05/07/1998
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 05/07/1998
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 05/07/1998
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/07/1998
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 05/07/1998
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/07/1998
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 05/07/1998
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/07/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/07/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/07/1998
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/07/1998
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/07/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/18/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 05/18/1998
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 05/20/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 06/03/1998
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/03/1998
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 06/09/1998
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/09/1998
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/17/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 07/14/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/15/1998
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/15/1998
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 07/17/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 07/17/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 07/17/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 07/20/1998
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 07/22/1998
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/22/1998
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 07/22/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/22/1998
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 07/30/1998
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 07/30/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/31/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 07/31/1998
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 08/03/1998
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 08/07/1998
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 09/10/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/17/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/23/1998
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/23/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 09/26/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/26/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 09/28/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 10/01/1998
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/01/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/10/1998
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/10/1998
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/10/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/13/1998