Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/12/1998
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 05/12/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 05/12/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/12/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/12/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/12/1998
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/12/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/12/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 05/12/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/12/1998
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/12/1998
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/12/1998
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 05/13/1998
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/13/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 05/13/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/13/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/13/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/13/1998
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 05/13/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/13/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/14/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/14/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 05/14/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/14/1998
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 05/14/1998
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 05/14/1998
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 05/14/1998
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 05/14/1998
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 05/14/1998
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 05/14/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/14/1998
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/14/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 05/14/1998
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/14/1998
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 05/14/1998
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/14/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/14/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/14/1998
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/14/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/14/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/14/1998
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/14/1998
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 05/14/1998
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 05/21/1998
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/21/1998
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/21/1998
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/21/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/21/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 05/21/1998
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 05/21/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/21/1998
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/21/1998
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 05/21/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/21/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/21/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/21/1998
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/21/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/21/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/21/1998
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/21/1998
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/21/1998
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 05/21/1998
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 05/21/1998
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 05/21/1998
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 05/21/1998
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 05/21/1998
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/21/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/21/1998
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/21/1998
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 05/21/1998
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 05/21/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/21/1998
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 05/21/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/21/1998
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/21/1998
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 05/21/1998
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 05/21/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 05/21/1998
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 05/21/1998
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/21/1998
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 05/21/1998
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/21/1998
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 05/21/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/21/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/21/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 05/21/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/21/1998
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/21/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/21/1998
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 05/21/1998
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 05/21/1998
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large] 05/21/1998
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/21/1998
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/21/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 05/21/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/21/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/21/1998
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/21/1998
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/05/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/05/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 06/05/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 06/05/1998
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/05/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/17/1998
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/17/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 06/17/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/17/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/17/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/17/1998
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/24/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/24/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 07/16/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 07/16/1998
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 07/16/1998
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/16/1998