Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 05/20/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/23/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/14/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 07/20/1998
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/20/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/20/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 08/06/1998