Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 05/07/1998
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 05/07/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 05/07/1998
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/03/1998
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/03/1998
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/03/1998
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/03/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/03/1998
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/03/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/03/1998
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 06/03/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/03/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/03/1998
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/03/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/03/1998
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 06/03/1998
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/03/1998
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 06/03/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/05/1998
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 06/05/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/05/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/05/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/05/1998
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/11/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/11/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/11/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 06/11/1998
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/11/1998
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 06/11/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/11/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/18/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/18/1998
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 06/18/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/18/1998
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/18/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/18/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 06/18/1998
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/23/1998
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 06/23/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 06/23/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/23/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/23/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/23/1998
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/25/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/25/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 06/25/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/25/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 06/25/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 06/25/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 06/25/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/25/1998
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/25/1998
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/25/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/25/1998
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 06/25/1998
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/25/1998
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 06/25/1998
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 06/25/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/25/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/25/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/14/1998
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 07/14/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 07/14/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/14/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 07/14/1998
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/14/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/14/1998
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/15/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/15/1998
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 07/20/1998
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/20/1998
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/20/1998
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/20/1998
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 07/20/1998
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 07/20/1998
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 07/20/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 07/20/1998
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/22/1998
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/22/1998
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 07/22/1998
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/22/1998
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/22/1998
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 07/22/1998
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 07/22/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/22/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 07/22/1998
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 07/22/1998
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 07/27/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/27/1998
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 07/27/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 07/27/1998
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/27/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/27/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/27/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 07/27/1998
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 07/27/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/27/1998
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 07/27/1998
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/27/1998
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 07/27/1998
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 07/27/1998
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 07/27/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/27/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/27/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/27/1998
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/28/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/28/1998
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 07/28/1998
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/29/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/29/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/29/1998
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/29/1998
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 07/29/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/29/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/29/1998