Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 01/09/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 01/09/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 01/09/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 01/09/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 01/21/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/21/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/21/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/21/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 01/21/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 01/21/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 01/21/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 01/21/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/21/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 01/21/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 01/21/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/04/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 02/04/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/04/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/04/1997
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/04/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 02/04/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 02/04/1997
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 02/04/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/04/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/04/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 02/04/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 02/04/1997
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 02/04/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/04/1997
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/04/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/04/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/04/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/04/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 02/04/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/04/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/05/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/05/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 02/12/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 02/12/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/12/1997
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 02/26/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/26/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/26/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/04/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/04/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 03/11/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/11/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/11/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/11/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/11/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/17/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 03/17/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/18/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/20/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 04/08/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 04/08/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/16/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/16/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 04/24/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/24/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/29/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/07/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/07/1997
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/25/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/06/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 11/04/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 10/05/1998