There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Children's Sleepwear Safety Act of 1998

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide that children's sleepwear shall be manufactured in accordance with stricter flammability standards.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/12/1998Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
05/26/1998Referred to the Subcommittee on Telecommunications, Trade, and Consumer Protection.
Action By: Committee on Commerce
05/12/1998Referred to the House Committee on Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/12/1998Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/12/1998
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 05/12/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/22/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/22/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/22/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/04/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/04/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/04/1998
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 06/04/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/04/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/04/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/04/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/04/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/23/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/23/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/23/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/23/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/15/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/15/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/15/1998
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/15/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 07/15/1998
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/15/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/15/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/29/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/29/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 07/30/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/30/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 08/04/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 08/06/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/11/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/16/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/16/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 09/17/1998
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/25/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/25/1998
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/25/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/01/1998

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Commerce05/12/1998 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Telecommunications, Trade, and Consumer Protection05/26/1998 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3831.


Subjects (14)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3831. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/12/1998)

Children's Sleepwear Safety Act of 1998 - Requires the Consumer Product Safety Commission to issue a rule amending its Flammable Fabrics Act standards to revoke specified amendments to standards for the flammability of children's sleepwear. Declares that no statute or Executive order shall apply regarding the promulgation of the amendment prescribed by this Act.