Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/12/1998
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 05/12/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/22/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/22/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/22/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/04/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/04/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/04/1998
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 06/04/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/04/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/04/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/04/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/04/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/23/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/23/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/23/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/23/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/15/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/15/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/15/1998
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/15/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 07/15/1998
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/15/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/15/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/29/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/29/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 07/30/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/30/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 08/04/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 08/06/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/11/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/16/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/16/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 09/17/1998
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/25/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/25/1998
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/25/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/01/1998