Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 05/12/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 05/12/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 05/12/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 05/12/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 05/12/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/12/1998
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 05/12/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 05/12/1998
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 05/12/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 05/12/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/18/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/18/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/18/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/18/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/21/1998
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 05/21/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/21/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/03/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 06/03/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/03/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/03/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/10/1998
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/10/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/10/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/10/1998
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 06/10/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/10/1998
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 06/10/1998
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/10/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/10/1998
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 06/10/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/23/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/23/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/23/1998
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 06/23/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/23/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/23/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/23/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/23/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/23/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 06/23/1998
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/23/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/23/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/23/1998
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/23/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/23/1998
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/23/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/23/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/27/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 07/27/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/27/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/27/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/27/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/27/1998
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/27/1998
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 07/27/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/27/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 07/27/1998
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 07/27/1998
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 07/27/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/27/1998
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/27/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 07/27/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 07/27/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/27/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/27/1998
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/27/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/27/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 07/27/1998
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/10/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/10/1998
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 09/10/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/10/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/10/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/10/1998
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/10/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/10/1998
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 09/10/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/10/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/10/1998
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 09/10/1998
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/10/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/10/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 09/10/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/10/1998
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/10/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/10/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 09/10/1998
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 09/10/1998
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/10/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/10/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/10/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 09/24/1998
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/24/1998
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/24/1998
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/24/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/24/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/24/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/24/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 10/07/1998
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 10/07/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 10/07/1998
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 10/07/1998
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 10/20/1998
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 10/20/1998
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/20/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 10/20/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/20/1998
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 10/20/1998