Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 05/21/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/21/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/21/1998
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/21/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/22/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/03/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 06/03/1998
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 06/03/1998
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/03/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 06/03/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/09/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 06/11/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 06/11/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/11/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/11/1998
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 06/11/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/17/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/17/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/17/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/17/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/17/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/14/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/14/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/14/1998
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/14/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/14/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/14/1998
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/14/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/14/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/17/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/17/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/17/1998
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/17/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/17/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 07/17/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/22/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/27/1998
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 07/27/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/27/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/27/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/31/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/31/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/31/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/31/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 08/06/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 08/06/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 08/06/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/09/1998
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/09/1998
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 09/09/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/14/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/14/1998
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 09/14/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 09/14/1998
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/23/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/23/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 09/23/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/23/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 09/23/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/23/1998
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/01/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/01/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/01/1998
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 10/01/1998
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 10/01/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/01/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 10/10/1998