Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/14/1998
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 05/14/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 05/14/1998
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 05/14/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/22/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 05/22/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/22/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/22/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/22/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/22/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/22/1998
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/22/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 06/05/1998
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 06/05/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/05/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 06/05/1998
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/05/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 06/05/1998
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/05/1998
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/05/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/05/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 06/05/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/11/1998
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/11/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/11/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/11/1998
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/11/1998
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/11/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/11/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/11/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 06/11/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/11/1998
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 06/11/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 06/19/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/19/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/19/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 06/19/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 06/19/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/17/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 07/17/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 07/17/1998
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 07/17/1998
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/17/1998
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/17/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/17/1998
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large] 07/17/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/17/1998
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 07/17/1998
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/17/1998
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 08/03/1998
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 08/03/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 08/03/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 08/03/1998
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 08/03/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 08/03/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 08/03/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 08/03/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 08/03/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/10/1998
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 09/10/1998
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 09/25/1998
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/25/1998
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 10/20/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/20/1998