Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 05/14/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 05/14/1998
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/17/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/17/1998
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 06/17/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/17/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/17/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/17/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/17/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 06/17/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/17/1998
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 06/17/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/17/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/24/1998
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/24/1998
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/24/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/24/1998
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/24/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/24/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/24/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 07/24/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/31/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 08/06/1998
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/15/1998
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/21/1998