Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/14/1998
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/14/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 05/14/1998
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 05/19/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/19/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/19/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/19/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 05/19/1998
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 05/19/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/19/1998
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/19/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/19/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 05/19/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 05/19/1998
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/19/1998
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/19/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/20/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/20/1998
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/20/1998
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 05/20/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/21/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/21/1998
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 05/21/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/21/1998
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/21/1998
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 05/21/1998
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 05/22/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/22/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/04/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 06/04/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 06/04/1998
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 06/04/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 06/04/1998
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/04/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 06/04/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/04/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/09/1998
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/09/1998
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 06/09/1998
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 06/09/1998
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 06/10/1998
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 06/10/1998
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/10/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 06/10/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/11/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/11/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/11/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/11/1998
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/11/1998
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 06/11/1998
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/18/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 06/18/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/18/1998
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/18/1998
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/18/1998
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 06/18/1998
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 06/18/1998
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/19/1998
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/19/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 06/24/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/24/1998
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 06/24/1998
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 07/14/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/14/1998
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 07/14/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/14/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/14/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 07/14/1998
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/14/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 07/14/1998
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 07/14/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 07/14/1998
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 07/14/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/14/1998
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/14/1998
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/16/1998
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/16/1998
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 07/16/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/20/1998
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/20/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/20/1998
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 07/22/1998
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/22/1998
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 07/22/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 07/22/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 07/29/1998
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 07/29/1998
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/29/1998
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 07/30/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/30/1998
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 08/05/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 08/05/1998
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 08/05/1998
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 09/10/1998
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/15/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/15/1998
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/15/1998
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 09/16/1998
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 09/22/1998
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/25/1998
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 10/02/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/05/1998
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 10/05/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 10/06/1998
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/06/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 10/06/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 10/06/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/07/1998
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 10/07/1998
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 10/07/1998
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 10/07/1998
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 10/09/1998
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 10/13/1998
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/20/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/20/1998