Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/20/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/03/1998
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/03/1998
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 06/03/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 06/03/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/10/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/10/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/19/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/15/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 08/06/1998