Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/20/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/20/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/20/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/20/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/20/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/20/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 05/20/1998
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/20/1998
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/20/1998
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/22/1998
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 05/22/1998
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/22/1998
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/22/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/22/1998
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 05/22/1998
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/22/1998
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 05/22/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/22/1998
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 05/22/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/22/1998
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 05/22/1998
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 05/22/1998
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 05/22/1998
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 05/22/1998
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 05/22/1998
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/22/1998
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/22/1998
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/22/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 05/22/1998
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/22/1998
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/03/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/03/1998
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/03/1998
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 06/03/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/03/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/03/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 06/03/1998
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/03/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 06/03/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 06/03/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/10/1998
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/10/1998
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 06/10/1998
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 06/10/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/10/1998
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/10/1998
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/16/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/16/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/16/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/19/1998
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 06/19/1998
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 06/24/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/15/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/15/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/23/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 08/06/1998