Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/21/1998
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 05/21/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 05/21/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 05/21/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/21/1998
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 05/21/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 05/21/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/21/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 05/21/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/03/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 06/03/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 06/23/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 07/29/1998
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/29/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/16/1998