Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 05/21/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/21/1998
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/21/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/21/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/21/1998
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 06/04/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/04/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/04/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/04/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/22/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 06/22/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/22/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/31/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/16/1998