Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/22/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 05/22/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 05/22/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 05/22/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/04/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/04/1998
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/04/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/04/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/04/1998
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/09/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 07/14/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 07/14/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 08/06/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/23/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/21/1998