Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/04/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/04/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/04/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/04/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/04/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 06/05/1998
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/05/1998
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/05/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 06/09/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/09/1998
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/09/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/09/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/09/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/09/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/09/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/09/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 06/11/1998
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 06/11/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/11/1998
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 06/16/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/16/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/16/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/16/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/16/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/16/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/16/1998
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/16/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/22/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/22/1998
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 06/22/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/22/1998
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/22/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/22/1998
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 06/22/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/22/1998
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/22/1998
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 06/22/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 06/25/1998
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/25/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/25/1998
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 06/25/1998
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/25/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 06/25/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/25/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 06/25/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 06/25/1998
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/25/1998
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/25/1998
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 07/14/1998
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/14/1998
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/14/1998
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/14/1998
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 07/14/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/14/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 07/14/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 07/14/1998
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 07/14/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/14/1998
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/14/1998
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large] 07/14/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/14/1998
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 07/14/1998
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 07/15/1998
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/15/1998
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 07/15/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/15/1998
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 07/15/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 07/15/1998
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/15/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/15/1998
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 07/16/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/16/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 07/16/1998
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 07/16/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 07/16/1998
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/16/1998
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 07/22/1998
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 07/22/1998
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 07/22/1998
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/22/1998
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 07/22/1998
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/22/1998
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 07/22/1998
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 07/22/1998
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 07/22/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/22/1998
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/22/1998
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/22/1998
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 07/22/1998
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/22/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/23/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 07/23/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 07/23/1998
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 08/06/1998
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 08/06/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 08/06/1998
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 08/06/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 08/06/1998
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 08/06/1998
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 08/06/1998
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/10/1998
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/15/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 09/24/1998
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 09/25/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/01/1998
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 10/06/1998
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 10/07/1998
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 10/09/1998
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 10/09/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/10/1998
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 10/20/1998