Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/03/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 06/03/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/03/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 06/03/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/05/1998
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/05/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/05/1998
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 06/17/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/17/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/19/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/22/1998
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/25/1998
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 06/25/1998
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/25/1998
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 06/25/1998
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/25/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/25/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/25/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/25/1998
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/25/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/25/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/25/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 06/25/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/25/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/25/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 07/14/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/14/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/14/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 07/14/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/14/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 07/14/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 07/14/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/14/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/14/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/14/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/14/1998
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/14/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/14/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/14/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/15/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/15/1998