Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 06/03/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 06/17/1998
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 06/17/1998
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/17/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/17/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/17/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/17/1998
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/17/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/17/1998
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 06/17/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/25/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/25/1998
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/25/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/25/1998
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/25/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 06/25/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 06/25/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 06/25/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/16/1998
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/16/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/16/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/16/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/16/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 07/16/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/16/1998
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/16/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/16/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 07/29/1998
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 07/29/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/29/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/29/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/29/1998
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 07/29/1998
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 07/29/1998
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/29/1998