Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 01/09/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 01/09/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 01/21/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 01/21/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 01/21/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/21/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 01/21/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/21/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/21/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 01/21/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 01/21/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 01/21/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 01/21/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/21/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 01/21/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/04/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/04/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/04/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/04/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/04/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 02/04/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 02/04/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 02/04/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/04/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 02/04/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/04/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 02/04/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/04/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 02/04/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/04/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/04/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 02/04/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/05/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 02/05/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 02/13/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/13/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/13/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/13/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/13/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/27/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 02/27/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/05/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/05/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/05/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/05/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 03/05/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/16/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/23/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 04/23/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 05/06/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 05/06/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/06/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/06/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/06/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/08/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 05/08/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/14/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/21/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/21/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 05/22/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 06/03/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/04/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/19/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/19/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/08/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/15/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/24/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 07/24/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/31/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/08/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/08/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/23/1997
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/06/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 10/24/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/24/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 01/27/1998