Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 02/04/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 02/04/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/04/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 02/04/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/04/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/13/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 02/13/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/13/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 02/25/1997
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 02/25/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/25/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/25/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/03/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/03/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/11/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/11/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/11/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 03/11/1997
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 03/11/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/11/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/11/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/18/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 03/18/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 03/18/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/18/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/20/1997
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/20/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 03/20/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/20/1997
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/20/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 03/20/1997