Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 06/05/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 06/05/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/05/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/05/1998
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 06/05/1998
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 06/05/1998
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/05/1998
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/09/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/09/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 06/09/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/09/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/10/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/10/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 06/10/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/10/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/10/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 06/10/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/10/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/10/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/10/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/10/1998
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/10/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/10/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/10/1998
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/10/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/16/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/16/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/16/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/16/1998
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/16/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/17/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/23/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/23/1998
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/23/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/23/1998
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/23/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/23/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/23/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/23/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/14/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/14/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 07/14/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/14/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/14/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/17/1998
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/17/1998
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 07/29/1998
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/29/1998
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 08/04/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 08/04/1998
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 09/09/1998
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 09/09/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/09/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 10/06/1998