Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 06/05/1998
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 06/05/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 06/05/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 06/05/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 06/05/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 06/05/1998
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 06/05/1998
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 06/05/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/25/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/25/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/25/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/25/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/25/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/25/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/25/1998
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/25/1998
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 07/14/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/14/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/14/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 07/14/1998
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/24/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/24/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/24/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 07/24/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/24/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/24/1998
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/02/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 10/02/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/02/1998
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 10/02/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/02/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/02/1998
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/02/1998