Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 06/09/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 06/09/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/09/1998
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 06/09/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 06/09/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/09/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 06/09/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/09/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 06/11/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/11/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/11/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/11/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/11/1998
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 06/17/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/17/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/17/1998
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/17/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 06/17/1998
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/17/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 06/17/1998
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/17/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/17/1998
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 06/19/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/19/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/19/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 06/19/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/19/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/19/1998
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/25/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 06/25/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/25/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/25/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/14/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 07/15/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/15/1998
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/15/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/15/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/15/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/15/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 08/04/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 08/04/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 08/04/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 08/04/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 08/04/1998
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 08/04/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 08/04/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/17/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 09/17/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/17/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 10/15/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 10/15/1998
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 10/15/1998