Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/09/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/19/1998
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/19/1998
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/22/1998
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 06/22/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 06/23/1998
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/23/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/24/1998
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/25/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/14/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 07/14/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/14/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/14/1998
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/14/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/14/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/15/1998
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 07/15/1998
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 07/23/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/23/1998
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/23/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/27/1998
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/27/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/27/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 07/31/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 07/31/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 08/06/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 08/06/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 08/06/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 08/06/1998
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 09/09/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/09/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/09/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/09/1998
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/09/1998
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/09/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/09/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/09/1998
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/10/1998
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/15/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/18/1998
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 09/18/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 09/23/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 09/23/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/24/1998
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/24/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 10/01/1998
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/01/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 10/01/1998
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/09/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 10/09/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/20/1998