Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/11/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3]* 06/11/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/11/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 06/11/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/11/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 06/11/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 06/11/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 06/11/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 06/11/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/11/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 06/11/1998
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 06/11/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 06/11/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 06/11/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/11/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12]* 06/11/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 06/11/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/11/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 06/11/1998
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 06/11/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 06/11/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 06/11/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/14/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/14/1998
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 07/14/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 07/14/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/14/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/14/1998
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/14/1998
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/14/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 07/14/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/14/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 07/14/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/14/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/14/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 07/14/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 07/14/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 07/14/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/14/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/14/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/14/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/14/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/20/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 07/20/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/20/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/20/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/20/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/20/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/27/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/27/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/27/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/27/1998
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 07/27/1998
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 07/27/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/27/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/27/1998
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/27/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 07/27/1998
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 07/27/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 07/27/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/27/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 07/27/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/27/1998
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 07/27/1998
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8] 07/27/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/27/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/27/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/27/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 07/27/1998
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/27/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/27/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/27/1998
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 08/03/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 08/03/1998
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 08/03/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 08/03/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 08/03/1998
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 08/03/1998
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 08/03/1998
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 08/03/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 08/03/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 08/03/1998
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 08/03/1998
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 08/03/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 08/03/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 08/03/1998
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 08/03/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 08/03/1998
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 08/07/1998
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 08/07/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 08/07/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 08/07/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 08/07/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 08/07/1998
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 08/07/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 08/07/1998
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 08/07/1998
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 08/07/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 08/07/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 08/07/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 08/07/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 08/07/1998
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 08/07/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 08/07/1998
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 08/07/1998
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 08/07/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/10/1998
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/10/1998
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/10/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/10/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/10/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/10/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 09/10/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 09/10/1998
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/10/1998
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 09/10/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 09/10/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/10/1998
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 09/10/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/10/1998
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/10/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 09/10/1998
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 09/10/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/10/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 09/10/1998
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 09/10/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/10/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/10/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/10/1998
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 09/10/1998
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 09/10/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/10/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/10/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 09/10/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/10/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/10/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 09/10/1998
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 09/10/1998
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/10/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/02/1998
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/02/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 10/02/1998
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 10/02/1998
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 10/02/1998
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 10/02/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 10/02/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/02/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/02/1998
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 10/02/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/02/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 10/02/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/02/1998
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 10/02/1998
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 10/02/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/02/1998
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/02/1998
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/02/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/02/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/02/1998
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 10/02/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 10/02/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/02/1998
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/02/1998
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 10/09/1998
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 10/09/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 10/09/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 10/09/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 10/09/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/09/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/09/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 10/09/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 10/09/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 10/09/1998
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 10/09/1998
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 10/15/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 10/20/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/20/1998